skip to content

Ghadieh, Omar M M

CPSO#: 97083

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 29 Sep 2016
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 04 Oct 2019

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:Jordan University of Sci. & Technology, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
167 Rolph St
Tillsonburg ON  N4G 3Y9
Phone: 2267000457 Electoral District: 02

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Brockville General Hospital Brockville
Health Sciences North Sudbury
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre Thunder Bay
Tillsonburg District Memorial Hospital Tillsonburg

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:04 Oct 2019 RCPSC Specialist
Nephrology Effective:04 Oct 2020 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. OMAR M M GHADIEH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GHADIEH is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Western University, 01 Jan 2012 to 01 Mar 2012
PEAP - CF - Nephrology

Western University, 02 Mar 2012 to 30 Jun 2012
CF - Nephrology

Western University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
CF - Nephrology

Western University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
CF - Nephrology

Western University, 01 Jul 2014 to 31 Dec 2014
CF - Nephrology

Western University, 01 Jan 2015 to 30 Jun 2015
CF - Nephrology

Western University, 01 Jul 2015 to 23 Sep 2015
AVP - Internal Medicine

Western University, 24 Sep 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

Western University, 05 Oct 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

Western University, 01 Jul 2017 to 04 Oct 2017
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

Western University, 05 Oct 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

Western University, 01 Jul 2018 to 04 Oct 2018
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 05 Oct 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
PostGrad Yr 4 - Nephrology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2019 to 04 Oct 2019
PostGrad Yr 4 - Nephrology

Queen's University, 05 Oct 2019 to 30 Jun 2020
PostGrad Yr 5 - Nephrology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2020 to 04 Oct 2020
PostGrad Yr 5 - Nephrology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jan 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 02 Mar 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 03 Dec 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 03 Dec 2014
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 30 Jun 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2015
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Sep 2015
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2016
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 05 Oct 2016
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Oct 2019