skip to content

Ghadai, Talha Ismaeel

CPSO#: 85821

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 07 Jan 2009
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 07 Jan 2009

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Spanish, Urdu

Education:Universidad Iberoamericana(UNIBE), 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
60 Town Centre Court
Unit 3
Scarborough ON  M1P 0B1
Phone: 416-792-2654
Fax: 416-792-4786 Electoral District: 10

Additional Practice Location(s)

Lakeridge Health
1 Hospital Court
2nd Floor, D-Wing
Oshawa ON  L1G 2B9
Canada
Phone: (905) 576-8711 Ext. 4579
Fax: (905) 721-7763
County: Regional Municipality of Durham
Electoral District: 05

186 Thornton Road South
Oshawa ON  L1J 5Y2
Canada
Phone: (905) 576-5181
County: Regional Municipality of Durham
Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Talha Ghadai Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 11 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. T. Ghadai ( CPSO# 85821 )
Dr. T. Kasmani ( CPSO# 96896 )

Business Address:
Lakeridge Health
1 Hospital Court
Oshawa ON  L1G 2B9
Phone Number: (905) 576-8711

Business Address:
3 - 60 Town Centre Court
Scarborough ON  M1P 0B1
Phone Number: (416) 792-2654

Business Address:
186 Thornton Road South
Oshawa ON  L1J 5Y2
Phone Number: (905) 576-5181

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Lakeridge Health,Clarington Site Bowmanville
Lakeridge Health,Oshawa General Site Oshawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:06 Jan 2009 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. TALHA ISMAEEL GHADAI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GHADAI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Ottawa, 01 Jan 2007 to 25 Mar 2007
AVP - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 26 Mar 2007 to 31 Dec 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jan 2008 to 31 Dec 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 09 Feb 2009 to 08 Feb 2010
CF - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jan 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 26 Mar 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Jan 2009