skip to content

Gevorgyan, Artur

CPSO#: 86313

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2007
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2012

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Armenian, English, Russian

Education:Yerevan State Medical University, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
5th Floor
117 King Street East
Oshawa ON  L1H 1B9
Phone: (905) 721-4943
Fax: (905) 721-6187 Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Artur Gevorgyan Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 06 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Gevorgyan ( CPSO# 86313 )

Business Address:
117 King Street East
5th Floor
Oshawa ON  L1H 1B9
Phone Number: (905) 721-4943

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Lakeridge Health,Ajax and Pickering Site Ajax
Lakeridge Health,Oshawa General Site Oshawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery Effective:30 Jun 2012 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. ARTUR GEVORGYAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GEVORGYAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 22 Sep 2007
AVP - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

University of Toronto, 23 Sep 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2012