skip to content

Geurtjens, Carla Marie

CPSO#: 98309

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2012
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 16 Aug 2016

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University Of Toronto, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 207
55 Wyndham St N
Guelph ON  N1H 6P6
Phone: 519-836-1455
Fax: 519-836-1321 Electoral District: 03

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Carla Geurtjens Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 12 2018

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Geurtjens ( CPSO# 98309 )

Business Address:
207 -55 Wyndham Street North
Guelph ON  N1H 7T8
Phone Number: (519) 836-1455

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation,Georgetown Hospital Georgetown

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:15 Aug 2016 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. CARLA MARIE GEURTJENS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GEURTJENS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 31 Dec 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

McMaster University, 01 Jan 2014 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2016 to 22 Aug 2016
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Aug 2016