skip to content

Gerretsen, Philip Matthew

CPSO#: 86749

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 30 Jun 2012
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2012

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Portuguese

Education:McMaster University, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
80 Workman Way
Toronto ON  M6J 1H4
Phone: (416) 535-8501 Electoral District: 10

Additional Practice Location(s)

200 Elizabeth St
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4
Canada
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Philip M. Gerretsen Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 30 2020

Shareholders:
Dr. P. Gerretsen ( CPSO# 86749 )

Business Address:
200 Elizabeth Street
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4

Business Address:
80 Workman Way
Toronto ON  M6J 1H4
Phone Number: (416) 535-8501

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Centre for Addiction & Mental Health,Queen Street Site Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective:30 Jun 2012 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. PHILIP MATTHEW GERRETSEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GERRETSEN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
CF - Psychiatry

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
CF - Psychiatry

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
CF - Psychiatry

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 31 Dec 2015
CF - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 18 Aug 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 18 Aug 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 30 Jun 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2012