skip to content

Gerber, David

CPSO#: 74111

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 08 Jul 1999
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 08 Jul 1999

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Afrikaans, Dutch, English

Education: University of Stellenbosch, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Meridia Medical Group
Suite 501
1881 Yonge Street
Toronto ON  M4S 3C4
Phone: (416) 484-8383
Fax: (416) 481-4963 Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. David Gerber Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 05 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Gerber ( CPSO# 74111 )

Business Address:
Meridia Medical Group
Suite 501
1881 Yonge Street
Toronto ON  M4S 3C4
Phone Number: (416) 484-8383

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective:30 Jun 1997 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. DAVID GERBER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GERBER is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
CF - Urology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 31 Dec 2000
CF - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Jul 1999

Pending Hearings

Summary:

Allegations of Dr. Gerber’s professional misconduct have been referred to the Ontario Physicians and Surgeons Discipline Tribunal. It is alleged that in 2007, 2012, 2013, 2014, 2015, 2016, 2018, 2019, and 2020, Dr. Gerber engaged in disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional conduct with respect to patients, including but not limited to in his communication with patients, and/or in failing to explain what the examination would involve and/or failing to obtain informed consent before proceeding with the examination, and/or in failing to demonstrate adequate sensitivity to patients; and that Dr. Gerber is incompetent and/or failed to maintain the standard of practice in his care and treatment of patients. It is also alleged that between 2012 and 2015, Dr. Gerber engaged in disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional conduct, including with respect to his conduct regarding a patient’s tattoo.

It is also alleged in 2019-2020, Dr. Gerber engaged in disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional conduct, including by failing to respond to inquiries from the College’s Out of Hospital Premises Inspection Program (OHPIP) and/or the College’s Independent Health Facilities Program (IHF) in a timely manner; failing to cooperate with OHPIP and/or IHF assessments/inspections, including but not limited to, by obstructing the assessment visits, failing to respond to outstanding inquiries or to address recommendations/conditions regarding the assessment and the assessment results in a timely manner; and/or engaging in unprofessional communications during the assessment/inspection(s).
 

Notice of Hearing: Download Full Notice (PDF)

Hearing Date(s): Motion: 03-May-2022

Concerns

Source: Compliance and Monitoring Department
Active Date: April 13, 2018
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Caution-in-Person:

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of the Committee. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a caution-in-person.
Download Full Document (PDF)