George, Thomas (CPSO#: 99015)

Current Status: Active Member as of 03 Oct 2017

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 03 Oct 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Witwatersrand, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St Michael's Hospital
Department of Anesthesia
1-026 Shuter Wing
30 Bond Street
Toronto ON  M5B 1W8
Phone: 416 864 5071
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Thomas George Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 08 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. T. George ( CPSO# 99015 )

Business Address:
St. Michael's Hospital
Department of Anaesthesia
30 Bond Street
Toronto ON  M5B 1W8
Phone Number: (416) 864-5071

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 05 Jun 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. THOMAS GEORGE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GEORGE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 12 Sep 2012
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 13 Sep 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 05 Jul 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Sep 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 22 Dec 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 22 Dec 2014
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 03 Oct 2017
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Oct 2017