skip to content

George, Stevan William

CPSO#: 19036

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 05 Jun 1996
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 08 May 1964

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Glasgow School of Medicine, 1956

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective:01 Jan 1963 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Dec 1959
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 09 Jul 1960
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 May 1964
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 05 Jun 1996