skip to content

George, Alexandra Marie

CPSO#: 95246

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2011
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 16 May 2014

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Grand River Community Health Centre
363 Colborne Street
Brantford ON  N3S 3N2
Phone: (519) 754-0777 Electoral District: 04

Additional Practice Location(s)

Brantford General Hospital
200 Terrace Hill St, Brantford, ON
Brantford ON  N3R 1G9
Canada
Phone: (519) 751-5544
County: County of Brant
Electoral District: 04

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Alexandra M. George Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 01 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. A. George ( CPSO# 95246 )

Business Address:
Grand River Community Health Centre
363 Colborne Street
Brantford ON  N3S 3N2
Phone Number: (519) 754-0777

Business Address:
200 Terrace Hill Street
Brantford ON  N3R 1G9
Phone Number: (519) 751-5544

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Brant Community Healthcare System Brantford

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:17 Jun 2013 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. ALEXANDRA MARIE GEORGE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GEORGE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 May 2014