skip to content

Forbes, Geoffrey George Alexander

CPSO#: 61317

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 1989
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 17 Aug 1990

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McGill University Faculty of Medicine an, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
2065 Finch Avenue West
Suite 310
Toronto ON  M3N 2V7
Phone: (416) 745-6244
Fax: (416) 746-6917 Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Geoffrey Forbes Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 19 2020

Shareholders:
Dr. G. Forbes ( CPSO# 61317 )

Business Address:
Suite 310
2065 Finch Avenue West
Toronto ON  M3N 2V7
Phone Number: (416) 745-6244

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Humber River Hospital,Wilson Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
No Speciality Reported

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. GEOFFREY GEORGE ALEXANDER FORBES may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FORBES is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 4 - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1989
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Aug 1990