skip to content

Gentili, Fred

CPSO#: 26037

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 15 Aug 1973
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 15 Aug 1973

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Italian

Education:University of Toronto, 1972

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Toronto Western Hospital
West Wing 4 - Room 445
399 Bathurst Street
Toronto ON  M5T 2S8
Phone: (416) 603-5250
Fax: (416) 603-5298 Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Fred Gentili Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Mar 20 2019
Corporation Name: Massicotte Tymianski Gentili Mohammadzadeh Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Oct 20 2016
Corporation Name: F. Gentili Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 05 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. F. Gentili ( CPSO# 26037 )

Business Address:
Toronto Western Hospital
West Wing 4
Room 445
399 Bathurst Street
Toronto ON  M5T 2S8
Phone Number: (416) 483-9161

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neurosurgery Effective:24 Nov 1980 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. FRED GENTILI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GENTILI is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Jun 1972
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Aug 1973