skip to content

Gencher, Moses

CPSO#: 16154

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership as of 03 Aug 2005
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 03 Aug 2005

Summary

Date of Death: 23-Dec-2006

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 1956

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 01 Jan 1964 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Jun 1957
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 03 Aug 2005
Member Portal will be undergoing maintenance between 09:00 pm and 12:00 am on Thursday April 18, 2019. We apologize for the inconvenience.