skip to content

Gelber, Herman

CPSO#: 18056

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 05 Jul 2013
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 31 Jul 1961

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Date of Death: 6-Sep-2013

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education: McGill University Faculty of Medicine an, 1960

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
 

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address:

Record Storage & Retrieval Services Inc.
111 St. Regis Crescent S.
Toronto, Ontario
M3J 1Y6
Tel: (416) 398-0638
Toll Free: 1-888-563-3732
Fax: (416) 398-5932
Website: www.rsrs.com
Date Received: 23 Jul 2013

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective:15 Nov 1965 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 31 Jul 1961
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 05 Jul 2013