skip to content

Geisler, William Oscar

CPSO#: 12612

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Emeritus status as of 06 Jul 2018
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 06 Jul 2018

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1948

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: 109 Park Rd Toronto ON M4W 2N8
Date Received: 01 Aug 2018

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 25 Nov 1957 RCPSC Specialist
Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation Effective: 09 Nov 1959 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Jul 1948
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 06 Jul 2018