skip to content

Geiling, James Arthur

CPSO#: 85296

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Committee terms and conditions as of 07 Jul 2008
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 03 Jul 2008

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:UNIFORMED SERVICES UNIVERSITY, 1982

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
No Speciality Reported

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 08 Jul 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 08 Jul 2006
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 05 Jul 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 14 Jul 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 03 Jul 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 07 Jul 2008