skip to content

Geier, Pavel

CPSO#: 85037

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 07 Jan 2009
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 07 Jan 2009

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Czech, English

Education:Charles Univ Prague, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ont
Department of Paediatrics
Division of Nephrology
401 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L1
Phone: (613) 737-7600 Ext. 2441 Electoral District: 07

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective:07 Jan 2009 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2006 to 31 Jul 2006
PEAP - CF - Paediatric Nephrology

University of Ottawa, 01 Aug 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
CF - Paediatric Nephrology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Aug 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 07 Jan 2009

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
Registration Committee Effective: 05 Dec 2011 Active
             1.    Dr. Pavel Geier may practise medicine only,

                  (i)   in  a  clinical  teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the
                        Department of Paediatrics, University of Ottawa, in which Dr. Geier
                        holds a geographical  full-time teaching or research appointment at
                        the rank of Associate Professor, and
                  
                  (ii)  to the extent required  by the teaching or research requirements of
                        his appointment.
                  
            2.    The certificate will automatically  expire when Dr. Geier no longer holds
                  the appointment, referred to in clause 1.