skip to content

Geddes, Christopher Robert

CPSO#: 87264

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2007
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2012

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:Dalhousie University, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
MSK Centre
Unit 115
675 Queen Street South
Kitchener ON  N2M 1A1
Phone: (519) 603-0605
Fax: (519) 603-0606 Electoral District: 03

Additional Practice Location(s)

Grand River Hospital
835 King Street West
Kitchener ON  N2G 1G3
Canada
County: Regional Municipality of Waterloo
Electoral District: 03

Working Condition Program
Holland Centre - Sunnybrook HSC
415 - 43 Wellesley Street East
Toronto ON  M4Y 1H1
Canada
Phone: (416) 967-8699
Fax: (416) 967-8579
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

153 Union St. East
Waterloo, ON
N2J 1C4
Waterloo ON  N2J1C4
Canada
Phone: 519-603-0989
Fax: 519-603-1258
County: Regional Municipality of Waterloo
Electoral District: 03

MSK WorkAssist
153 Union St. East, Waterloo
N2J 1C4
Waterloo ON  N2J 1C4
Canada
Phone: 519-603-0989
Fax: 519-603-1258
County: Regional Municipality of Waterloo
Electoral District: 03

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Christopher Geddes Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 25 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Geddes ( CPSO# 87264 )

Business Address:
No business address available

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Grand River Hospital Corporation,Kitchener Waterloo Site Kitchener
St Mary's General Hospital,Kitchener Kitchener
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre,Holland Orthopaedic & Arthritic Centre Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective:30 Jun 2012 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. CHRISTOPHER ROBERT GEDDES may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GEDDES is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Orthopedic Surgery

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Orthopedic Surgery

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Orthopedic Surgery

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Orthopedic Surgery

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Orthopedic Surgery

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
CF - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2012