skip to content

Gebremicael, Eyob Yacob

CPSO#: 87650

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 27 Jul 2011
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 27 Jul 2011

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Amharic, English, Eritrean

Education:Addis Ababa University, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
North Oshawa Medical Centre
1400 Ritson Road North
Oshawa ON  L1G 7W4
Phone: (905) 433-4284 Electoral District: 05

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
No Speciality Reported

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 04 Sep 2007 to 26 Nov 2007
AVP - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 27 Nov 2007 to 03 Sep 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 04 Sep 2008 to 03 Sep 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 04 Sep 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 27 Nov 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 03 Sep 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 17 Feb 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 27 Jul 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 27 Jul 2011
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 21 Jun 2012
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 06 Jul 2012

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
Registration Committee Effective: 21 Jun 2012 Active
             Dr.  Eyob  Yacob  Gebremicael  may  practice  medicine  independently in family
            medicine, only.