skip to content

Ge, Hong

CPSO#: 86899

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 24 Jun 2010
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 24 Jun 2010

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Chinese, English

Education:Second Military Medical University, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Pacific Medical Clinic
Unit F33
4300 Steeles Avenue East
Markham ON  L3R 0Y5
Phone: (905) 604-7889
Fax: (905) 604-7890 Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Hong Ge Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 27 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. H. Ge ( CPSO# 86899 )

Business Address:
Pacific Medical Clinic
Unit F33
4300 Steeles Avenue East
Markham ON  L3R 0Y5
Phone Number: (905) 604-7889

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:22 Jun 2010 CFPC Specialist
Public Health and Preventive Medicine Effective:30 Jun 2011 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. HONG GE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Community Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Community Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Community Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 5 - Community Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jun 2010