Gazala, Sayf Shawqi George (CPSO#: 100093)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2015

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 13 Apr 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:University of Al-Mustansiriyah, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Michael Garron Hospital
Chest Centre
825 Coxwell Avenue
East York ON  M4C 3E7
Phone: (647)349-9300
Fax: (416)469-6834
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Sayf Gazala Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 06 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Gazala ( CPSO# 100093)

Business Address:
Michael Garron Hospital
Suite G2
825 Coxwell Avenue
East York ON  M4C 3E7
Phone Number: (647) 349-9300

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Michael Garron Hospital - Toronto East Health Network Toronto
Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre Barrie
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2015 RCPSC Specialist
Thoracic Surgery Effective: 20 Oct 2017 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SAYF SHAWQI GEORGE GAZALA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GAZALA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 07 May 2013 to 03 Jun 2013
Elective Trainee - Thoracic Surgery

University of Ottawa, 23 Sep 2013 to 20 Oct 2013
Elective Trainee - Thoracic Surgery

University of Toronto, 10 Mar 2014 to 06 Apr 2014
Elective Trainee - Thoracic Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 6 - Thoracic Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 7 - Thoracic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 07 May 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 03 Jun 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 20 Oct 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 10 Mar 2014
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 06 Apr 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2015
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Apr 2017