skip to content

Gaviolli, Eduardo Luiz Cansian

CPSO#: 88849

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Terms and conditions as of 07 Nov 2019
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 14 Mar 2012

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Faculdade de Medicina de Taubate, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
No Speciality Reported

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Ottawa, 12 Dec 2011 to 04 Mar 2012
AVP - Neurosurgery

University of Ottawa, 05 Mar 2012 to 21 Dec 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Neurosurgery

University of Ottawa, 22 Dec 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Neurosurgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Radiation Oncology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Radiation Oncology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Radiation Oncology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - Radiation Oncology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 5 - Radiation Oncology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
CF - Radiation Oncology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2019 to 30 Sep 2019
CF - Radiation Oncology

University of Ottawa, 01 Oct 2019 to 07 Nov 2019
CF - Radiation Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 22 Sep 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 12 Dec 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 04 Mar 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Mar 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 07 Nov 2019