skip to content

Gavigan, Genevieve Marie

CPSO#: 95857

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 03 Oct 2017
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 03 Oct 2017

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
401 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L1
Phone: (613) 737-7600
Fax: (613) 738-4298 Electoral District: 07

Additional Practice Location(s)

Elisabeth Bruyere Hospital
Dermatology Clinics
Unit 214Y
43 Bruyere Street
Ottawa ON  K1N 5C8
Canada
Phone: (613) 562-6354
Fax: (613) 562-6022
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07

Vital Medical Clinic
224 Hunt Club Road
Ottawa ON  K1V 1C1
Canada
Phone: 613-248-1010
Fax: 613-248-1019
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: G. Gavigan Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 28 2018

Shareholders:
Dr. G. Gavigan ( CPSO# 95857 )

Business Address:
401 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L1
Phone Number: (613) 737-7600

Business Address:
Elisabeth Bruyere Hospital
2144 - 43 Bruyere Street
Ottawa ON  K1N 5C8
Phone Number: (613) 562-6354

Business Address:
Vital Medical Centre
224 Hunt Club Rd
Ottawa ON  K1V 1C1
Phone Number: (613) 248-1010

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Bruyere Continuing Care-Elisabeth Bruyere Site Ottawa
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Dermatology Effective:30 Sep 2017 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. GENEVIEVE MARIE GAVIGAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GAVIGAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Dermatology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Dermatology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Dermatology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Dermatology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Dermatology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2016 to 31 Dec 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Dermatology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jan 2017 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - Dermatology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Sep 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - Dermatology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Sep 2017
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Oct 2017