skip to content

Gauvin, Lianne

CPSO#: 91074

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 16 Feb 2012
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 16 Feb 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Box 1270
1403 Edward Street
Hearst ON  P0L 1N0
Phone: (705) 362-5544 Ext. 227
Fax: (705) 362-4184 Electoral District: 08

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Lianne Gauvin Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 24 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. L. Gauvin ( CPSO# 91074 )

Business Address:
1403 Edward Street
PO Box 1270
Hearst ON  P0L 1N0
Phone Number: (705) 362-5544

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Notre-Dame Hospital Hearst

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 07 Feb 2012 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. LIANNE GAUVIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GAUVIN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 01 Jul 2010 to 13 Feb 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 14 Feb 2011 to 13 Feb 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 13 Feb 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Feb 2012