skip to content

Gauthier, Jean-Claude

CPSO#: 86320

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2007
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2012

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 170
1130 Morrison Drive
Ottawa ON  K2H 9N6
Phone: (613) 828-2442
Fax: (613) 225-3652 Electoral District: 07

Additional Practice Location(s)

Queensway-Carleton Hospital
3045 Baseline Road
Ottawa ON  K2H 8P4
Canada
Phone: (613) 721-2000
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07

75 Spring Street
Almonte ON  K0A 1A0
Canada
Phone: (613) 256-2500
Fax: (613) 256-8549
County: County of Lanark
Electoral District: 07

1910 Saint-Laurent Blvd
Unit 29
Ottawa ON  K1G 1A4
Canada
Phone: (613) 686-6656
Fax: (613) 248-9009
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07

Rose Ages Breast Health Centre
501 Smyth Road
Cancer Centre 4th floor
Minto Pavillion
Ottawa ON  K1H8L6
Canada
Phone: 6137614400
Fax: 613-761-4405
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07

2 Gurdwara Road
Nepean ON  K2E1A2
Canada
Phone: 6132161823
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: JC Gauthier Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 25 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Gauthier ( CPSO# 86320 )

Business Address:
75 Spring Street
Almonte ON  K0A 1A0
Phone Number: (613) 256-2500

Business Address:
Unit 29
1910 Saint-Laurent Boulevard
Ottawa ON  K1G 1A4
Phone Number: (613) 686-6656

Business Address:
170 - 1130 Morrison Drive
Ottawa ON  K2H 9N6
Phone Number: (613) 828-2442

Business Address:
Queensway-Carleton Hospital
3045 Baseline Road
Ottawa ON  K2H 8P4
Phone Number: (613) 721-2000

Business Address:
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Phone Number: (613) 761-4400

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Almonte General Hospital Almonte
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa
Queensway Carleton Hospital Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective:30 Jun 2012 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. JEAN-CLAUDE GAUTHIER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GAUTHIER is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
CF - General Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2012