Gauster, Andrea (CPSO#: 100273)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2013

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 25 Jun 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French, German

Education:Queen's University, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
462 Paxton Street
Port Perry ON  L9L 1L9
Phone: (905) 985-2895 Ext. 5424
Fax: (844) 847-8842
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

1 Hospital Court
Oshawa ON  L1G 2B9
Canada
Phone: 905-576-8711
County: Regional Municipality of Durham
Electoral District: 05

451 Paxton St
Port Perry ON  L9L 1L9
Canada
Phone: 905-985-7321 Ext. 4953
County: Regional Municipality of Durham
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Ali Gauster Schurter Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 13 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Schurter ( CPSO# 82718 )
Dr. M. Brown ( CPSO# 69023 )
Dr. A. Pawley ( CPSO# 87461 )
Dr. S. Hyshka ( CPSO# 67972 )
Dr. E. Russell ( CPSO# 59302 )
Dr. J. Ross ( CPSO# 88724 )
Dr. R. Wray ( CPSO# 86630 )
Dr. H. Nguyen ( CPSO# 88893 )
Dr. S. Cull ( CPSO# 82751 )
Dr. F. Nasser-Sharif ( CPSO# 72700 )
Dr. A. Chiella ( CPSO# 74700 )
Dr. K. Ferguson ( CPSO# 76506 )
Dr. K. Best ( CPSO# 75245 )
Dr. N. Kazarian ( CPSO# 71482 )
Dr. S. Shepherd ( CPSO# 71354 )
Dr. A. Dayal ( CPSO# 79055 )
Dr. A. Gauster ( CPSO# 100273)
Dr. P. Puckrin ( CPSO# 27488 )
Dr. R. Allin ( CPSO# 20746 )
Dr. M. Stewart ( CPSO# 62187 )
Dr. G. Mercer ( CPSO# 60472 )
Dr. A. Brown ( CPSO# 59455 )
Dr. S. Russell ( CPSO# 60638 )
Dr. M. Gilmour ( CPSO# 59725 )
Dr. J. Tuck ( CPSO# 64782 )
Dr. C. Hadden ( CPSO# 100522)
Dr. J. Moran ( CPSO# 100903)
Dr. A. Bruno ( CPSO# 101160)
Dr. D. Wang ( CPSO# 90666 )
Dr. B. Tse ( CPSO# 91489 )
Dr. F. Ali ( CPSO# 76181 )
Dr. R. Adams ( CPSO# 72364 )
Dr. T. Stryde ( CPSO# 73931 )
Dr. C. Westbrook ( CPSO# 89258 )
Dr. A. Armstrong ( CPSO# 84261 )

Business Address:
Medical Associates of Port Perry
462 Paxton Street
Port Perry ON  L9L 1L9
Phone Number: (905) 985-2895


Corporation Name: Andrea Gauster Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 18 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Gauster ( CPSO# 100273)

Business Address:
Suite 108
462 Paxton Street
Port Perry ON  L9L 1L9
Phone Number: (905) 985-2895

Business Address:
Lakeridge Health
451 Paxton Street
Port Perry ON  L9L 1L9
Phone Number: (905) 985-7321

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Lakeridge Health Scugog Port Perry Site Port Perry
Lakeridge Health,Ajax and Pickering Site Ajax
Lakeridge Health,Clarington Site Bowmanville
Lakeridge Health,Oshawa General Site Oshawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 22 Jun 2015 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ANDREA GAUSTER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GAUSTER is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jun 2015