skip to content

Gately, John Frederick

CPSO#: 23053

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2013
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 23 Jul 1970

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Date of Death: 9-Aug-2013

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Cambridge, 1967

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Patients looking to obtain a copy of their medical record should contact: McMaster University Health Centre 1200 Main St. West Hamilton, ON L8N 3Z5 Tel: (905) 521-2100
Date Received: 20 Jun 2013

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective:01 Jan 1980 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jul 1970
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2013