skip to content

Gartenberg, David Samuel

CPSO#: 25716

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 31 Jul 2014
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 22 Feb 1994

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:Max Rady College of Medicine, University, 1972

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:01 Jul 1974 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 10 Jun 1972
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jun 1973
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 07 Mar 1975
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Feb 1994
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 31 Jul 2014