skip to content

Garry, Thomas Vincent

CPSO#: 26006

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 13 Jan 2005
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 13 Jan 2005
Flag: Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Irish Conjoint Board, 1966

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
No Speciality Reported

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Aug 1973
Suspension of registration imposed: Discipline Committee Effective: 01 May 2000
Suspension of registration removed Effective: 01 Jul 2000
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 13 Jan 2005

Previous Hearings Flag: indicates a concern or additional information

Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 05 Apr 2000
Summary:

 On April 5, 2000, the Discipline Committee accepted Dr. Garry(s plea of guilty and found him guilty 
 of professional misconduct in that he signed or issued, in his professional capacity, documents he 
 knew or ought to have known were false or misleading and engaging in conduct that would be 
 regarded by members as disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional. The Committee ordered the 
 following penalty:

(1)	Dr. Garry to appear before the panel to be reprimanded;
(2)	The fact of 
 the reprimand is to be recorded on the Register;
(3)	The Registrar is directed to suspend Dr. 
 Garry(s certificate of registration for a period of two months, the suspension to commence on a 
 date to be fixed by the Registrar, within 60 days of this order becoming final;
(4)	Dr. Garry is 
 to pay to the College, $5,000.00 in costs, to be paid in the amount of $1,000.00 per month to be 
 paid on the first day of May, June, July, August and September, 2000.


Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): Apr 05, 2000