skip to content

Garrioch, Gregory Francis

CPSO#: 33499

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 06 Jul 1982
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 06 Jul 1982

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1981

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
1935 Paris Street
Sudbury ON  P3E 3C6
Phone: (705) 522-1018 Electoral District: 08

Additional Practice Location(s)

Occupational Medicine
VALE-INCO International Engineering
Building
Copper Cliff ON  P0M 1N0
Canada
Phone: (705) 682-5176
Fax: (705) 682-5700
County: Terr.District/Regional Municipality of Sudbury
Electoral District: 08

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. G. Garrioch Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 22 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. G. Garrioch ( CPSO# 33499 )

Business Address:
1935 Paris Street
Sudbury ON  P3E 3C6
Phone Number: (705) 522-1018

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Health Sciences North Sudbury

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 05 Jan 2015 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. GREGORY FRANCIS GARRIOCH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GARRIOCH is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1981
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 15 Jun 1982
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Jul 1982