skip to content

Garretto, Anthony Samuel

CPSO#: 96971

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 31 Oct 2011
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 01 Oct 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:St George's University of Grenada, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Pembroke Regional Hospital
Emergency Department
705 Mackay Street
Pembroke ON  K8A 1G8
Phone: (613) 732-2811 Electoral District: 07

Additional Practice Location(s)

156 John St
Pembroke ON  K8A1H5
Canada
Phone: 6137357469
County: County of Renfrew
Electoral District: 07

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Garretto Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 08 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Garretto ( CPSO# 96971 )

Business Address:
156 John Street
Pembroke ON  K8A 1H5
Phone Number: (613) 735-7469

Business Address:
Pembroke Regional Hospital
Emergency Department
705 Mackay Street
Pembroke ON  K8A 1G8
Phone Number: (613) 732-2811

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Pembroke Regional Hospital Pembroke

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 30 Oct 2013 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. ANTHONY SAMUEL GARRETTO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GARRETTO is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 31 Oct 2011 to 22 Jan 2012
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 23 Jan 2012 to 30 Oct 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 31 Oct 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Oct 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 31 Oct 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 17 Nov 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 31 Oct 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Jan 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Oct 2014