skip to content

Garon, Jennifer Danielle

CPSO#: 97706

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 07 Jul 2014
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 07 Jul 2014

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Aurora Family Health Clinic
971 Carrick Street
Thunder Bay ON  P7B 6L9
Phone: (807) 285-1894
Fax: (807) 285-2098 Electoral District: 09

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: J. Danielle Garon Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 24 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Garon ( CPSO# 97706 )

Business Address:
Aurora Family Health Clinic
971 Carrick Street
Thunder Bay ON  P7B 6L9
Phone Number: (807) 285-1894

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Joseph's Care Group,Thunder Bay Thunder Bay
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre Thunder Bay

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:03 Jul 2014 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. JENNIFER DANIELLE GARON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GARON is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Jul 2014