skip to content

Garofeanu, Gheorghita Camelia

CPSO#: 90019

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 22 Jul 2011
EXPIRY DATE
22 Jul 2011
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 09 Jul 2010

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Institute Medicine, Pharmacy,Timisoara, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective:30 Jun 2010 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 17 Nov 2008 to 28 Feb 2009
EL - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
CF - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Nov 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 28 Feb 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Jul 2010
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 22 Jul 2011