skip to content

Garnett, Robert Lawrie

CPSO#: 23603

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 03 Jul 2013
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 03 Jul 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 1970

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: R.L. Garnett Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Aug 23 2013

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 01 Jan 1978 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1970
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Feb 1971
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 03 Jul 2013