Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Female
Languages Spoken: English, Telugu
Education: Kurnool Medical College, 1990
No Privileges reported.
Source: Hospital Active Date: October 12, 2018 Expiry Date: Summary: On October 12, 2018, Health Sciences North (HSN) notified the College, pursuant to s.85.5 of the Health Professions Procedural Code, Regulated Health Professions Act, that Dr. Padma Garisa has agreed not to exercise her hospital privileges at HSN and, further, has agreed to resign her hospital privileges at HSN by no later than March 31, 2019.
Source: Hospital Active Date: February 2, 2017 Expiry Date: Summary: On August 3, 2017, Health Sciences North (HSN) notified the College that in February 2017, Dr. Padma Garisa agreed not to exercise her privileges within the OB-GYNE Department at HSN until an external review of Dr. Garisa’s practice had been completed.
As from July 22, 2019, the following are imposed as terms, conditions and limitations on the certificate of registration held by Dr. Padma Lata Garisa, in accordance with an undertaking and consent given by Dr. Garisa to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario: UNDERTAKING, ACKNOWLEDGEMENT AND CONSENT ("Undertaking") of DR. PADMA LATA GARISA ("Dr. Garisa") to COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (the "College") A. PREAMBLE (1) In this Undertaking: "Code" means the Health Professions Procedural Code, which is Schedule 2 to the Regulated Health Professions Act, 1991, S.O. 1991, c. 18, as amended; "Discipline Committee" means the Discipline Committee of the College; "OHIP" means the Ontario Health Insurance Plan "Public Register" means the College's register that is available to the public. (2) I, Dr. Garisa, certificate of registration number 88111, am a member of the College. (3) I, Dr. Garisa, acknowledge that the College conducted an investigation bearing File Number 7215971 (the "Investigation") into whether I engaged in professional misconduct and/or am incompetent in my obstetrics and gynaecology practice. B. UNDERTAKING (4) I, Dr. Garisa, undertake to abide by the provisions of this Undertaking, effective immediately. (5) Practice Restrictions (a) I, Dr. Garisa, undertake that I will not practice hospital-based obstetrics, and that I will only practice obstetrics in an office setting. (b) I, Dr. Garisa, undertake that I will not provide prenatal care to patients beyond thirty-two (32) weeks' gestation. (6) Monitoring (a) I, Dr. Garisa, undertake to inform the College of each and every location where I practise or have privileges, including, but not limited to, any hospitals, clinics, offices, and any Independent Health Facilities with which I am affiliated, in any jurisdiction (collectively my "Practice Location" or "Practice Locations"), within five (5) days of executing this Undertaking. Going forward, I further undertake to inform the College of any and all new Practice Locations within five (5) days of commencing practice at that location. (b) I, Dr. Garisa, undertake that I will submit to, and not interfere with, unannounced inspections of my Practice Locations and patient charts by a College representative for the purposes of monitoring my compliance with the provisions of this Undertaking. (c) I, Dr. Garisa, give my irrevocable consent to the College to make appropriate enquiries of OHIP, and/or any person who or institution that may have relevant information, in order for the College to monitor my compliance with the provisions of this Undertaking. (d) I, Dr. Garisa, acknowledge that I have executed the OHIP consent form, attached hereto as Appendix "A". C. ACKNOWLEDGEMENT (7) I, Dr. Garisa, acknowledge that all appendices attached to or referred to in this Undertaking form part of this Undertaking. (8) I, Dr. Garisa, acknowledge and undertake that I shall be solely responsible for payment of all fees, costs, charges, expenses, etc. arising from the implementation of any of the provisions of this Undertaking. (9) I, Dr. Garisa, acknowledge that I have read and understand the provisions of this Undertaking and that I have obtained independent legal counsel in reviewing and executing this Undertaking, or have waived my right to do so. (10) I, Dr. Garisa, acknowledge that the College will provide this Undertaking to any Chief of Staff, or a colleague with similar responsibilities, at any Practice Location ("Chief of Staff" or "Chiefs of Staff"). (11) I, Dr. Garisa, acknowledge that a breach by me of any provision of this Undertaking may constitute an act of professional misconduct and/or incompetence, and may result in a referral of specified allegations to the Discipline Committee. (12) I, Dr. Garisa, acknowledge that this Undertaking constitutes terms, conditions, and limitations on my certificate of registration for the purposes of section 23 of the Code. (13) Public Register (a) I, Dr. Garisa, acknowledge that, during the time period that this Undertaking remains in effect, this Undertaking shall be posted on the Public Register. (b) I, Dr. Garisa, acknowledge that, in addition to this Undertaking being posted in accordance with section (15)(a) above, the following summary shall be posted on the Public Register during the time period that this Undertaking remains in effect: A College investigation was conducted into whether Dr. Garisa engaged in professional misconduct and/or was incompetent in the practice of obstetrics and gynaecology. As a result of the investigation: Dr. Garisa will not practice hospital-based obstetrics, and will only practice obstetrics in an office setting. Dr. Garisa will not provide prenatal care to patients beyond 32 weeks' gestation. D. CONSENT (14) I, Dr. Garisa, give my irrevocable consent to the College to provide all Chiefs of Staff with any information the College has that led to the circumstances of my entering into this Undertaking and/or any information arising from the monitoring of my compliance with this Undertaking.
Source: Member Active Date: July 22, 2019 Expiry Date: Summary: Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Padma Lata Garisa to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective July 22, 2019:A College investigation was conducted into whether Dr. Garisa engaged in professional misconduct and/or was incompetent in the practice of obstetrics and gynaecology. As a result of the investigation:Dr. Garisa will not practice hospital-based obstetrics, and will only practice obstetrics in an office setting.Dr. Garisa will not provide prenatal care to patients beyond 32 weeks’ gestation.
Source: Compliance and Monitoring Department Active Date: March 15, 2019 Expiry Date: Summary: Caution-in-Person: A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of the Committee. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a caution-in-person. Download Full Document (PDF)