skip to content

Garisa, Padma Lata

CPSO#: 88111

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 26 Feb 2008
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 22 Jul 2019

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Telugu

Education:Kurnool Medical College, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
435, Notre dame avenue
Sudbury ON  P3C 5K6
Phone: (705) 675-2100
Fax: (705) 675-2101 Electoral District: 08

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Padma Garisa Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: May 24 2021

Hospital Privileges

No Privileges reported.


Hospital Notices

Source:  Hospital
Active Date:  October 12, 2018
Expiry Date:  
Summary:  
On October 12, 2018, Health Sciences North (HSN) notified the College, pursuant to s.85.5 of the Health Professions Procedural Code, Regulated Health Professions Act, that Dr. Padma Garisa has agreed not to exercise her hospital privileges at HSN and, further, has agreed to resign her hospital privileges at HSN by no later than March 31, 2019.

Source:  Hospital
Active Date:  February 2, 2017
Expiry Date:  
Summary:  
On August 3, 2017, Health Sciences North (HSN) notified the College that in February 2017, Dr. Padma Garisa agreed not to exercise her privileges within the OB-GYNE Department at HSN until an external review of Dr. Garisa’s practice had been completed.

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective:28 May 2006 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Feb 2008
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 22 Jul 2019
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by member Effective: 22 Jul 2019

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
member Effective: 22 Jul 2019 Active
             As from July 22, 2019, the following are imposed as terms, conditions and
            limitations on the certificate of registration held by Dr. Padma Lata Garisa,
            in accordance with an undertaking and consent given by Dr. Garisa to the
            College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:

                        UNDERTAKING, ACKNOWLEDGEMENT AND CONSENT
                                          ("Undertaking")
                  
                                                of
                  
                                    DR. PADMA LATA GARISA
                                          ("Dr. Garisa")
                  
                                                to
                  
                        COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO
                                          (the "College")
                  
                                                                                     

            A.    PREAMBLE

            (1)   In this Undertaking:

                  "Code" means the Health Professions Procedural Code, which is Schedule 2
                  to the Regulated Health Professions Act, 1991, S.O. 1991, c. 18, as
                  amended; 
                  
                  "Discipline Committee" means the Discipline Committee of the College;
                  
                   "OHIP" means the Ontario Health Insurance Plan
                  
                  "Public Register" means the College's register that is available to the
                  public.
                  
            (2)   I, Dr. Garisa, certificate of registration number 88111, am a member of
                  the College.

            (3)   I, Dr. Garisa, acknowledge that the College conducted an investigation
                  bearing File Number 7215971 (the "Investigation") into whether I engaged
                  in professional misconduct and/or am incompetent in my obstetrics and
                  gynaecology practice.

            B.    UNDERTAKING

            (4)   I, Dr. Garisa, undertake to abide by the provisions of this Undertaking,
                  effective immediately. 

            (5)   Practice Restrictions

                  (a)   I, Dr. Garisa, undertake that I will not practice hospital-based
                        obstetrics, and that I will only practice obstetrics in an office
                        setting.
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Garisa, undertake that I will not provide prenatal care to
                        patients beyond thirty-two (32) weeks' gestation.
                  
            (6)   Monitoring 

                  (a)   I, Dr. Garisa, undertake to inform the College of each and every
                        location where I practise or have privileges, including, but not
                        limited to, any hospitals, clinics, offices, and any Independent
                        Health Facilities with which I am affiliated, in any jurisdiction
                        (collectively my "Practice Location" or "Practice Locations"),
                        within five (5) days of executing this Undertaking.  Going forward,
                        I further undertake to inform the College of any and all new
                        Practice Locations within five (5) days of commencing practice at
                        that location.
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Garisa, undertake that I will submit to, and not interfere
                        with, unannounced inspections of my Practice Locations and patient
                        charts by a College representative for the purposes of monitoring
                        my compliance with the provisions of this Undertaking.
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Garisa, give my irrevocable consent to the College to make
                        appropriate enquiries of OHIP, and/or any person who or institution
                        that may have relevant information, in order for the College to
                        monitor my compliance with the provisions of this Undertaking.
                  
                  (d)   I, Dr. Garisa, acknowledge that I have executed the OHIP consent
                        form, attached hereto as Appendix "A".
                  
            C.    ACKNOWLEDGEMENT

            (7)   I, Dr. Garisa, acknowledge that all appendices attached to or referred to
                  in this Undertaking form part of this Undertaking.

            (8)   I, Dr. Garisa, acknowledge and undertake that I shall be solely
                  responsible for payment of all fees, costs, charges, expenses, etc.
                  arising from the implementation of any of the provisions of this
                  Undertaking. 

            (9)   I, Dr. Garisa, acknowledge that I have read and understand the provisions
                  of this Undertaking and that I have obtained independent legal counsel in
                  reviewing and executing this Undertaking, or have waived my right to do
                  so.

            (10)  I, Dr. Garisa, acknowledge that the College will provide this Undertaking
                  to any Chief of Staff, or a colleague with similar responsibilities, at
                  any Practice Location ("Chief of Staff" or "Chiefs of Staff").

            (11)  I, Dr. Garisa, acknowledge that a breach by me of any provision of this
                  Undertaking may constitute an act of professional misconduct and/or
                  incompetence, and may result in a referral of specified allegations to
                  the Discipline Committee.

            (12)  I, Dr. Garisa, acknowledge that this Undertaking constitutes terms,
                  conditions, and limitations on my certificate of registration for the
                  purposes of section 23 of the Code. 

            (13)  Public Register

                  (a)   I, Dr. Garisa, acknowledge that, during the time period that this
                        Undertaking remains in effect, this Undertaking shall be posted on
                        the Public Register.
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Garisa, acknowledge that, in addition to this Undertaking
                        being posted in accordance with section (15)(a) above, the
                        following summary shall be posted on the Public Register during the
                        time period that this Undertaking remains in effect:
                  
                              A College investigation was conducted into whether Dr. Garisa
                              engaged in professional misconduct and/or was incompetent in
                              the practice of obstetrics and gynaecology. As a result of
                              the investigation:
                  
                                    Dr. Garisa will not practice hospital-based obstetrics,
                                    and will only practice obstetrics in an office setting.
                  
                                    Dr. Garisa will not provide prenatal care to patients
                                    beyond 32 weeks' gestation. 
                  
            D.    CONSENT

            (14)  I, Dr. Garisa, give my irrevocable consent to the College to provide all
                  Chiefs of Staff with any information the College has that led to the
                  circumstances of my entering into this Undertaking and/or any information
                  arising from the monitoring of my compliance with this Undertaking.

Concerns

Source: Member
Active Date: July 22, 2019
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Padma Lata Garisa to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective July 22, 2019:

A College investigation was conducted into whether Dr. Garisa engaged in professional misconduct and/or was incompetent in the practice of obstetrics and gynaecology. As a result of the investigation:

Dr. Garisa will not practice hospital-based obstetrics, and will only practice obstetrics in an office setting.

Dr. Garisa will not provide prenatal care to patients beyond 32 weeks’ gestation.

 

Source: Compliance and Monitoring Department
Active Date: March 15, 2019
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Caution-in-Person:

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of the Committee. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a caution-in-person.
Download Full Document (PDF)