skip to content

Gargoum, Hassan Abdulla Mohamed

CPSO#: 85939

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership as of 04 Sep 2020
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 02 Feb 2007

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: Mohamed, Hassan Abdalla (used until: 29 Jun 2010 )

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:Garyounis University, 1980

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



Saskatchewan

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:05 Jun 1990 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective:26 Nov 1991 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Feb 2007
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 04 Sep 2020