skip to content

Garg, Pallav

CPSO#: 96554

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 13 Jul 2011
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 13 Jul 2011

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi

Education:University of Melbourne, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
LHSC University Campus
Division of Cardiology
339 Windermere Rd
London ON  N6A 5A5
Phone: (519) 663-3627
Fax: (519) 663-2997 Electoral District: 02

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: P. Garg Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 12 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. P. Garg ( CPSO# 96554 )

Business Address:
LHSC University Campus
Division of Cardiology
339 Windermere Road
London ON  N6A 5A5
Phone Number: (519) 663-3627


Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



Australia

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
London Health Sciences Centre,University Site London

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Cardiology Effective:14 Dec 2017 CPSO Recognized Specialist
Internal Medicine Effective:14 Dec 2017 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 13 Jul 2011
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 13 Jul 2011
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2014
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 14 Dec 2017

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
Registration Committee Effective: 14 Dec 2017 Active
             Dr.  Pallav  Garg  may practise medicine independently in internal medicine and
            cardiology.