skip to content

Gare, Douglas John

CPSO#: 18195

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Member deceased as of 03 May 2019
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 03 May 2019
Flag: Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Date of Death: 3-May-2019

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1960

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 30 Nov 1965 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Feb 1962
Expired: Member deceased. Expiry date: 03 May 2019

Previous Hearings Flag: indicates a concern or additional information

Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 21 Sep 1983
Summary:

 In September 1983, the Discipline Committee found Dr. Gare guilty of professional misconduct, as 
 defined in Ontario Regulation 448/80, in that he failed to carry out the terms of an agreement 
 with a patient, contrary to s. 27(10); and in that he failed to maintain the standard of practice 
 of the profession, contrary to s. 27(21).  Consequently, the Committee ordered that Dr. Gare be 
 reprimanded, and that his licence to practise medicine be suspended for thirty days.

Appeal: Appeal Dismissed
Appeal Decision Date: 21 Feb 1985
Hearing Date(s): 19 Sep 1983