skip to content

Gardhouse, Amanda Isabel

CPSO#: 92896

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2010
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 16 Dec 2014

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 175
25 Museum Drive
Orillia ON  L3V 7T9
Phone: (705) 329-3649 Ext. 228
Fax: (705) 325-8148 Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Amanda Gardhouse Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 18 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Gardhouse ( CPSO# 92896 )

Business Address:
175 - 25 Museum Drive
Orillia ON  L3V 7T9
Phone Number: (705) 329-3649

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Orillia Soldiers Memorial Hospital Orillia

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:16 Dec 2014 RCPSC Specialist
Geriatric Medicine Effective:27 Sep 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. AMANDA ISABEL GARDHOUSE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GARDHOUSE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 16 Dec 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 17 Dec 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Geriatric Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 16 Dec 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Geriatric Medicine

University of Toronto, 17 Dec 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Geriatric Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Geriatric Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Dec 2014