skip to content

Garcia Thibodeau, Claudia

CPSO#: 101166

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2013
EXPIRY DATE
30 Jun 2020
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Postgraduate Education as of 01 Jul 2013

Summary

Former Name: Garcia, Claudia (used until: 21 Jun 2016 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Saskatchewan, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
CAMH Clarke Institute of Psychiatry
Department of Psychiatry
250 College Street
Toronto ON  M5T 1R8
Phone: 416 535 8501 Ext. 30868 Electoral District: 10

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. CLAUDIA GARCIA THIBODEAU shall practise medicine only as required by the postgraduate medical education program in which Dr. GARCIA THIBODEAU is enrolled at UNIVERSITY OF TORONTO;

(2) Dr. GARCIA THIBODEAU shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. GARCIA THIBODEAU is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;

(3) Dr. GARCIA THIBODEAU shall not charge a fee for medical services;

(4) The certificate expires on the earlier of the following times: when Dr. GARCIA THIBODEAU is no longer enrolled in a program of postgraduate medical education provided by a medical school in Ontario, or when Dr. GARCIA THIBODEAU no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).

Note: This certificate expires on 30 Jun 2020.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 5 - Child and Adolescent Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
PostGrad Yr 6 - Child and Adolescent Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2019 to 30 Jun 2020
PostGrad Yr 6 - Child and Adolescent Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2020