skip to content

Garbens, Alaina

CPSO#: 96088

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 21 Apr 2021
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 21 Apr 2021

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Vaughan Urology Associates
2630 Rutherford Road, Suite 201
Vaughan ON  L4K 0H2
Phone: 905-832-8428
Fax: 905-832-6651 Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Alaina Garbens Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 02 2021

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Garbens ( CPSO# 96088 )

Business Address:
2630 Rutherford Rd
Suite 201
Concord ON  L4K 0H2
Phone Number: 903-832-8428

Business Address:
3200 Major Mackenzie Dr
Maple ON  L6A 4Z3
Phone Number: (905) 883-1212

Business Address:
10 Trench St
Richmond Hill ON  L4C 4Z3
Phone Number: (905) 883-1212

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Urology Effective:30 Jun 2019 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. ALAINA GARBENS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GARBENS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Urology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Urology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Urology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Urology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Urology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - Urology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 5 - Urology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
PostGrad Yr 5 - Urology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 12 Nov 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 12 Nov 2015
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 01 Jul 2016
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 30 Jun 2017
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2017
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2019
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Apr 2021