skip to content

Garavaglia, Marco Maria

CPSO#: 92152

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jan 2013
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 01 Jan 2013

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Italian

Education:Univ degli Studi del Piemonte Orientale, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
U H N Toronto Western Hospital
Department of Anesthesia and Pain
Medicine
McL 2-405 - 399 Bathurst St
Toronto ON  M5T 2S8
Phone: (416) 603-5118 Electoral District: 10

Additional Practice Location(s)

Women's College Hospital
76 Grenville St, Toronto
Toronto ON  M5S 1B2
Canada
Phone: 416-323-6269
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: M. Garavaglia Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 14 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Garavaglia ( CPSO# 92152 )

Business Address:
UHN Toronto Western Hospital
Department of Anaesthesia and Pain
Room MCL2-045
399 Bathurst Street
Toronto ON  M5T 2S8
Phone Number: (416) 603-5118


Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



Italy

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective:13 Dec 2018 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Oct 2009 to 17 Nov 2009
PEAP - CF - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 18 Nov 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
CF - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
CF - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
CF - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 31 Dec 2012
CF - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Oct 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 18 Nov 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 16 Aug 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 16 Aug 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 31 Dec 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Jan 2013
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 13 Dec 2018

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
Registration Committee Effective: 13 Dec 2018 Active
             Dr.   Marco   Maria   Garavaglia   may   practise   medicine  independently  in
            anesthesiology.