skip to content

Gapski, John Andrew

CPSO#: 28156

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 13 Jun 2019
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 13 Jun 2019

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Polish

Education:University of Ottawa, 1974

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: John Gapski Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jun 7 2019

Medical Records Location

Address: 2004 Stavebank Rd Mississauga ON L5C 1T2
Date Received: 14 Jun 2019

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 12 Nov 1979 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 1974
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 May 1976
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 13 Jun 2019