skip to content

Gao, Andrew Feng

CPSO#: 98164

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2012
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2019

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
UHN Toronto General Hospital
Department of Pathology
200 Elizabeth Street, 11 Eaton
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4
Phone: (416) 340-4800 Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston
Lakeridge Health,Oshawa General Site Oshawa
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neuropathology Effective:30 Jun 2019 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. ANDREW FENG GAO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GAO is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Neuropathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Neuropathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Neuropathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 2 - Neuropathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 3 - Neuropathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 4 - Neuropathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
PostGrad Yr 5 - Neuropathology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2019