skip to content

Gantareddy, Susheel Reddy

CPSO#: 99527

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 09 Jan 2015
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 09 Jan 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Telugu

Education:St. Matthew's University, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
6-715 Coronation Blvd
Cambridge ON  N1R 7R1
Phone: (519) 621-2424
Fax: 855 530 6121 Electoral District: 03

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: SR Gantareddy Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 17 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Gantareddy ( CPSO# 99527 )

Business Address:
715 Coronation Boulevard
Suite 6
Cambridge ON  N1R 7R1
Phone Number: (519) 621-2424

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 16 Dec 2014 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. SUSHEEL REDDY GANTAREDDY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GANTAREDDY is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 22 Oct 2012 to 13 Jan 2013
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 14 Jan 2013 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 01 Jul 2013 to 20 Oct 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 21 Oct 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 01 Jul 2014 to 20 Oct 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 22 Oct 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Jan 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 20 Oct 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Jan 2015