skip to content

Gans, Marvin Howard

CPSO#: 19609

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 09 Jul 1965
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 09 Jul 1965

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1963

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suit 301 - 491 Eglinton Ave W
491 Eglinton Ave.W.
Toronto
M5N 1A8
Toronto ON  M5N 1A8
Phone: (416) 848-7665
Fax: (416) 848-7664 Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Marvin Gans Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 10 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Gans ( CPSO# 19609 )

Business Address:
Suite 301
491 Eglinton Avenue West
Toronto ON  M5M 1A8
Phone Number: (416) 848-7665

Medical Records Location

Address: Records Management Ltd. 13 - 1 High Meadow Place Toronto ON M9L 0A3 or Call toll free at: 1-800-775-0093 or visit www.recordsregistry.ca
Date Received: 28 Aug 2018

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 01 Jan 1968 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. MARVIN HOWARD GANS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GANS is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1963
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Jul 1965