skip to content

Gannon, William Augustine

CPSO#: 28762

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 10 Sep 1976
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 10 Sep 1976

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Dublin, 1969

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
481 London Road
Sarnia ON  N7T 4X3
Phone: (519) 344-8849
Fax: (519) 344-8840 Electoral District: 01

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: William A. Gannon Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 16 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. W. Gannon ( CPSO# 28762 )

Business Address:
481 London Road
Sarnia ON  N7T 4X3
Phone Number: (519) 344-8849

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. WILLIAM AUGUSTINE GANNON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GANNON is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Jun 1975
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 13 Jun 1976
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1976
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Sep 1976