skip to content

Gannon, Kathleen Elizabeth

CPSO#: 90071

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 31 Jul 2009
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 31 Jul 2009

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University College of Dublin, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
440 Central Avenue, Suite 701
London ON  N6B 2E9
Phone: (519) 601-7577
Fax: (519) 601-7737 Electoral District: 02

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Gannon Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 11 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Gannon ( CPSO# 90071 )

Business Address:
701 - 440 Central Avenue
London ON  N6B 2E5
Phone Number: (519) 601-7577

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
London Health Sciences Centre,University Site London
St Joseph's Health Care-St Joseph's Site,London London

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:29 Jun 2009 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. KATHLEEN ELIZABETH GANNON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GANNON is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 18 Dec 2008 to 13 Jan 2009
EL - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 18 Dec 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 13 Jan 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 31 Jul 2009