skip to content

Gangani, Asmitha

CPSO#: 92184

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 16 Feb 2012
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 16 Feb 2012

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Gujarati, Hindi, Kannada, Russian, Tamil, Urdu

Education:Kazakh State Medical University, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Oak Ridges Medical and Urgent Care
Centre
Suite 100
13291 Yonge Street
Richmond Hill ON  L4E 4L6
Phone: (905) 773-7759
Fax: (905) 773-1325 Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Asmitha Gangani Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 05 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Gangani ( CPSO# 92184 )

Business Address:
Oak Ridges Medical and Urgent Care Centre
102 - 13291 Yonge Street
Richmond Hill ON  L4E 4L6
Phone Number: (905) 773-7759

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:14 Dec 2011 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. ASMITHA GANGANI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GANGANI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Queen's University, 20 Oct 2009 to 11 Jan 2010
AVP - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 12 Jan 2010 to 10 Jan 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 11 Jan 2011 to 10 Jan 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 20 Oct 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Jan 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 10 Jan 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Feb 2012