skip to content

Ganeshalingam, Anushiya

CPSO#: 93064

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 18 Oct 2012
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 18 Oct 2012

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Markham Heritage Clinic
5970 16th Ave Unit #128
Markham ON  L3P 7R1
Phone: (905) 471-2967
Fax: (905) 471-0476 Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Anushiya Ganeshalingam Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 01 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Ganeshalingam ( CPSO# 93064 )

Business Address:
Markham Heritage Clinic
Suite 128
5970 16th Avenue
Markham ON  L3P 7R1
Phone Number: (905) 471-2967

Business Address:
381 Church Street
Markham ON  L3P 7P3
Phone Number: (905) 472-7000

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Markham Stouffville Hospital Markham

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:18 Jun 2012 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. ANUSHIYA GANESHALINGAM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GANESHALINGAM is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Oct 2012